There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution condemning bigotry and violence against Sikh-Americans in the wake of terrorist attacks in New York City and Washington, D.C. on September 11, 2001.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/18/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/2001Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
10/02/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/27/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/23/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
10/23/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/23/2001-12:40pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/18/2001SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.
10/18/2001SenateS.Amdt.1908 Amendment SA 1908 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/18/2001SenateS.Amdt.1908 Amendment SA 1908 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Durbin. (consideration: CR S10850; text: CR S10850) To clarify Congress' concern over the number of crimes against Sikh-Americans across the Nation since the tragic events of September 11, 2001.
10/18/2001SenateS.Amdt.1907 Amendment SA 1907 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/18/2001SenateS.Amdt.1907 Amendment SA 1907 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Durbin. (consideration: CR S10849-10850; text: CR S10849-10850) In the nature of a substitute.
10/18/2001SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10849-10850)
10/04/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183.
10/04/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
10/04/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/02/2001SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S10067)
10/02/2001SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S10067-10068)

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 10/02/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/03/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 10/03/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/09/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/10/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/11/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/15/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary10/02/2001 Referred to
10/04/2001 Markup by
10/04/2001 Reported by
House Judiciary10/23/2001 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution11/27/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.74. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/18/2001)

Declares that, in the quest to identify, locate, and bring to justice the perpetrators and sponsors of the September 11, 2001, terrorist attacks on the United States, the civil rights and liberties of all Americans, including Sikh-Americans, should be protected.

Condemns bigotry and acts of violence or discrimination against any Americans, including Sikh-Americans.

Calls upon local and Federal law enforcement authorities to: (1) work to prevent crimes against all Americans; and (2) prosecute to the fullest extent of the law all those who commit crimes.