Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/13/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/13/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/13/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/13/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/13/2001
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/19/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/19/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/19/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/29/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/29/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/29/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/29/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/29/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/05/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/01/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/13/2001

Show cosponsors who withdrew