There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution granting the consent of Congress to the International Emergency Management Assistance Memorandum of Understanding.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14050; text as passed Senate: CR S14050-14052)
10/31/2001Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
03/28/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/23/2002-4:48pmHouseHeld at the desk.
01/23/2002-12:28pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/23/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14050; text as passed Senate: CR S14050-14052)
10/31/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 211.
10/31/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
10/18/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/28/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3063-3064)

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/18/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/18/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/18/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/18/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/01/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/06/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/04/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary03/28/2001 Referred to
10/18/2001 Markup by
10/31/2001 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.12.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.12. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (10/31/2001)

Grants the consent of Congress to the International Emergency Management Assistance Memorandum of Understanding entered into between the States of Maine, New Hampshire, Vermont, Massachusetts, Rhode Island, and Connecticut and the Provinces of Quebec, New Brunswick, Prince Edward Island, Nova Scotia, and Newfoundland.