Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 04/24/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/30/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/01/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/02/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/07/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/09/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/10/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/10/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/30/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/12/2001