Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 05/14/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 05/14/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/14/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/14/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/14/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/14/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/22/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/04/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/10/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/12/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/12/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/18/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/31/2002