Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 02/07/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/01/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/15/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/19/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/26/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/26/2001