Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 10/02/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 10/02/2002
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 10/02/2002
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 10/02/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 10/02/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 10/02/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/02/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 10/02/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 10/02/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 10/02/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 10/03/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/04/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/07/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/07/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/09/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/10/2002