Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/08/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/09/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/09/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/10/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/15/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/17/2002