Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/13/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/13/2001
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/26/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/26/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/09/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/14/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/05/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/29/2001

Show cosponsors who withdrew