Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/27/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/27/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/27/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 02/28/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/28/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/28/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/28/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/28/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/05/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/05/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/05/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/05/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/05/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/05/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/05/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/07/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/07/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/07/2001
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/07/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/07/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/07/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/07/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/12/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/12/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/12/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/12/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 03/12/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/12/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/12/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/12/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/13/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/13/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/13/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/14/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/14/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/14/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/14/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/14/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/15/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/15/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/15/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/15/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/15/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/15/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 03/15/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/15/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/15/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/15/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/15/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/15/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/15/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/15/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/15/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/15/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/15/2001
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/15/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/15/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/15/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/15/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/15/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/15/2001