Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/05/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/05/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 09/05/2002
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 09/05/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/18/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/23/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/30/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/15/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/13/2002