Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 10/10/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/16/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/17/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/17/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/17/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/17/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 10/17/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/12/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/14/2002
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 11/19/2002