Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/22/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/22/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/23/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/27/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/29/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/29/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/29/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/02/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/03/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/25/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/26/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/26/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/30/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/30/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/30/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/30/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/30/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/30/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/01/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 05/01/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/02/2001
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/09/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/14/2001