Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/30/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/30/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/16/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/17/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/17/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/21/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/21/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/21/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/23/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/23/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 05/23/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/23/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/23/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/05/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/05/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/05/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/06/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/07/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/07/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/11/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/12/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/12/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/12/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/14/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/14/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/14/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/14/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/20/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/20/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/20/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/20/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/20/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/25/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/25/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/26/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/26/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/28/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/28/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/28/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/29/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/29/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/09/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/16/2001