Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/28/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/28/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/02/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/02/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/02/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/02/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/02/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/02/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/02/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/02/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/02/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/02/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/02/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/02/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/03/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/03/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/07/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/08/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/08/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/30/2003