Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/26/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/26/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/26/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/01/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/01/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/01/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/06/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/06/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/06/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/06/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/13/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/13/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/13/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/03/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/03/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/03/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/03/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/03/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/12/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/12/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/12/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/23/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/23/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/23/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/23/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/26/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/26/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/16/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/23/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/09/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew