Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/27/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/02/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/08/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/19/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/26/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/15/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/17/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/17/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/17/2003