Committees: H.R.1038 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources02/27/2003 Referred to
07/09/2003 Markup by
09/10/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-218,Part 1
H. Rept. 108-218,Part 2
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands03/17/2003 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health03/17/2003 Referred to
06/19/2003 Hearings by
07/09/2003 Discharged from
House Agriculture02/27/2003 Referred to
09/15/2003 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition, and Forestry03/18/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary07/17/2003 Referred to
09/10/2003 Markup by
09/15/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-218,Part 3
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security09/04/2003 Referred to
09/05/2003 Discharged from