Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/04/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 03/04/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/04/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/04/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/11/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/11/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/11/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/01/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/01/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/01/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/03/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/01/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 11/18/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 11/18/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/11/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/11/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/11/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/24/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/25/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/25/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/25/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/25/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 03/25/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/30/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/31/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/31/2004
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/31/2004
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/31/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/20/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/28/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/28/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/28/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/28/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/30/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/30/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/04/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/04/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/05/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/06/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/11/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/07/2004
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/07/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/12/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/13/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/13/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/14/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/19/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/19/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/20/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/07/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/21/2004