Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/12/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 01/20/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/04/2004