Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/20/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/27/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/07/2003