Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/05/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/20/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/08/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/14/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/21/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/04/2003