Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/20/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/20/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/20/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/20/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/19/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/26/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/26/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/10/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/10/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 02/11/2004