Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/06/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/06/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/06/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/11/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/11/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/13/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/25/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/03/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/08/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/12/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/17/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/17/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/18/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/24/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/24/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/17/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/30/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/30/2004