Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/11/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/11/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/31/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/15/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/10/2003