Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/05/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/11/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/11/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/11/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/11/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/11/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/13/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/13/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/13/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/13/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/18/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/18/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/26/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/26/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/01/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/01/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/18/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/18/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/26/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/10/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/17/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/17/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/07/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/07/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/15/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/04/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/10/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/10/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/30/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/18/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/09/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/15/2004