Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/02/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/29/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/14/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/14/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/14/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/14/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/14/2004