Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/31/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/02/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/16/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/10/2003