There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Asbestos Compensation Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish legal standards and procedures for the fair, prompt, inexpensive, and efficient resolution of personal injury claims arising out of asbestos exposure, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/06/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/17/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5459)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2003Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/06/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/11/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/11/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/11/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/11/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 03/18/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/18/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/18/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/12/2003
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/06/2003 03/18/2003 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/06/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1114.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1114. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/06/2003)

Asbestos Compensation Act of 2003 - Establishes in the Department of Justice the Office of Asbestos Compensation (OAC) with exclusive jurisdiction over proceedings to determine if a claimant is entitled to compensation for an asbestos claim and the amount of such compensation. Excludes any claim brought under any workers' compensation law or veterans' benefits program.

Establishes within OAC: (1) an Asbestos Compensation Fund to make payments to claimants under this Act; and (2) an Office of Administrative Law Judges for expedited administrative adjudication of asbestos claims..

Requires the OAC to implement a legal assistance program to provide legal representation to claimants.

Prescribes guidelines governing: (1) medical eligibility; (2) damages; (3) come back rights; (4) class actions; (5) core claims; (6) eligible medical categories; (7) fiscal and financial management of the Asbestos Compensation Fund; and (8) transitional civil actions.