Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/06/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/11/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/11/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/11/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/11/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 03/18/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/18/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/18/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/12/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew