Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/06/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/12/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/20/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/02/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/09/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/10/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/09/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/13/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/13/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/19/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/19/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/21/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/21/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/21/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/04/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/09/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/09/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/09/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/09/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/09/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/09/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/09/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/09/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/09/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/09/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/09/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/09/2003