Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/19/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/19/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/19/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/19/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/19/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/19/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/27/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/27/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/27/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/27/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/13/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/20/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/21/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/05/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/05/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/19/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/10/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/10/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/10/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/25/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/05/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/05/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/08/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/17/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/08/2004