Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/12/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/21/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/17/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/24/2003