Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/10/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/24/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/08/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/01/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/21/2004