Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/06/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/06/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/11/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/12/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/13/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/18/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/18/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/19/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/19/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/19/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/20/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/20/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/20/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/25/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/25/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/26/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/27/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/31/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/01/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/02/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/03/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/07/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/07/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/10/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/10/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/30/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/08/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/08/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/14/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/14/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/14/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/14/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/19/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/19/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/19/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/20/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/03/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/09/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/09/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/10/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/10/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/11/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/17/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/26/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/08/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/08/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/10/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/03/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/28/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/28/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/21/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/08/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/08/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/19/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/19/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/20/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/2004