Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/06/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/06/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/13/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/24/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/17/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/09/2004