Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/12/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/17/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/23/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/24/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/24/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/25/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/08/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/15/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/22/2003