Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/10/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/10/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/10/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/10/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/31/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/31/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/31/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/31/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/31/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/31/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/31/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/31/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/31/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/31/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/31/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/31/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/31/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 04/11/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/19/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/21/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/17/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/06/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/07/2004