Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/11/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/13/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/19/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/07/2003