There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Commercial Driver's License Devolution Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to permit an individual to operate a commercial motor vehicle solely within the borders of a State if the individual meets certain minimum standards prescribed by the State, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/11/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/12/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways, Transit and Pipelines.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/12/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E442-443)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/2003Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/02/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/02/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/03/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/09/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/01/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/19/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/02/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/03/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/04/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/16/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/10/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/16/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/11/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/03/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/11/2003 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways, Transit and Pipelines03/12/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1179. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/11/2003)

Commercial Driver's License Devolution Act of 2003 - Amends Federal transportation law to authorize an individual to operate a commercial motor vehicle solely within the borders of a State (intrastate) if such individual: (1) meets State-prescribed minimum standards for fitness for operating a commercial motor vehicle; and (2) has passed written and driving tests meeting those same standards. Requires States to test the fitness of commercial motor vehicle operators, including with written and driving tests, who operate intrastate.