Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/02/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/02/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/03/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/09/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/01/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/19/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/02/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/03/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/04/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/16/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/10/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/16/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/11/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/03/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/2004