Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/11/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/11/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/11/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/11/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/11/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/11/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/11/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/11/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/11/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/05/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/05/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/05/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/05/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/13/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/13/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/13/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/13/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/13/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/13/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/13/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/13/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/13/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/13/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/13/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/13/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/13/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/15/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/15/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/15/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/19/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/21/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/21/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/21/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/21/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/21/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/22/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/02/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/05/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/05/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/05/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/10/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/10/2003