Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/03/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/16/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/06/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/05/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/17/2004