There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Holocaust Victims Insurance Relief Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the establishment of the Holocaust Insurance Registry by the Archivist of the United States and to require certain disclosures by insurers to the Secretary of Commerce.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/11/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
03/28/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets, Insurance and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
03/25/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and the Census.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
03/11/2003Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/2003Referred to House Financial Services
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/2003Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/11/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/11/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/11/2003
Del. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/01/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/01/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/01/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/07/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/07/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/07/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/07/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/07/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/07/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/09/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/05/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/05/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/23/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/15/2003

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services03/11/2003 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets, Insurance and Government Sponsored Enterprises03/28/2003 Referred to
House Government Reform03/11/2003 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and the Census03/25/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1210.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1210. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/11/2003)

Holocaust Victims Insurance Relief Act of 2003 - Directs the Archivist of the United States to establish and maintain a Holocaust Insurance Registry of information on holders, issuers, and related liable entities of Holocaust-era insurance policies that were: (1) in effect after January 30, 1933, and before December 31, 1945; and (2) issued to a policyholder domiciled in any area of Europe that was occupied or controlled by Nazi Germany or any ally or sympathizer during such period.

Requires: (1) insurers to file such information in an electronic format with the Secretary of Commerce by a specified deadline; (2) the Secretary to assess a civil penalty for each day of insurer noncompliance; and (3) the Secretary to notify each State's commissioner of insurance of the identity of any insurer that has failed to file either such information or to satisfy such civil penalty.

Declares that nothing in this Act preempts the right of any State to adopt or enforce any State law requiring an insurer to disclose information regarding insurance policies that may have been confiscated or stolen from victims of Nazi persecution.

Expresses the sense of Congress that if any litigation challenging such a State law is dismissed because the State's commissioner of insurance chooses to rely on this Act and therefore no longer seeks to enforce the State law, each party should bear its own legal fees and costs.