Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/11/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/20/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/27/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/27/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/03/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/22/2003