Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/13/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/13/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/13/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/15/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/03/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/07/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/08/2004