Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/29/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/29/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/30/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/12/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/18/2004