Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/12/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/19/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/19/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/20/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/20/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/20/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/20/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/20/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/20/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/27/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/27/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/27/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/27/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/27/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/27/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/27/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/27/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/27/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/27/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/03/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/03/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/03/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/03/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/03/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/03/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/07/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/07/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/07/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/07/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/07/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/06/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/06/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 05/06/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/06/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/06/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/09/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/09/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/09/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/09/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/15/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/15/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/02/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/02/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/10/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/11/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/24/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/09/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/14/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/17/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/17/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/21/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/03/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/04/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/22/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/14/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/08/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/22/2004