Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/08/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/08/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/08/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/11/2003