Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/12/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/12/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/12/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/12/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/26/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/26/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/26/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/26/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/08/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/08/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/19/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/29/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/06/2004